MD HB96 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting covered entities from taking certain actions regarding organ transplantation and anatomical gifts solely on the basis of an individual's financial status; and requiring, except under certain circumstances, covered entities to make certain modifications to policies, practices, and procedures to allow an individual with financial issues access to services related to organ transplantation.
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation - Financial Status
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-01-26 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-01-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2021-10-07 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Discrimination
Gifts
Health
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Organ Donorship
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Gifts
Health
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Organ Donorship
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 20 | 1601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |