MD HB958 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the confidentiality, under specified circumstances, of information that an insurer files with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner as proprietary rate-related information; requiring the Commissioner, if the Commissioner makes a specified determination, to give an insurer specified notice of a determination and to make specified material open to specified public inspection; requiring the People's Insurance Counsel Division to maintain the confidentiality of specified proprietary rate-related information; etc.
Title
Insurance - Rate Filings - Trade Secrets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499 |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {987376/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {353692/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Disclosure
Inspections
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Law Enforcement
Notices
Privacy
Trade Secrets
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Disclosure
Inspections
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Law Enforcement
Notices
Privacy
Trade Secrets