MD HB954 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 389
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a Class B beer, wine, and liquor license holder in the 45th legislative district to exchange the license for a Class B-D-7 beer, wine, and liquor license if the licensed premises is in a certain area and an applicant executes a memorandum of understanding with the Mount Vernon-Belvedere Improvement Association; providing that a certain license holder is authorized to provide outdoor table service; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B and Class C Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 389
2020-03-18HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (128-0)
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-18SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator McCray) Adopted
2020-03-18SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator McCray) Adopted
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-18SenateFloor Amendment {713229/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB328 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 390

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages12102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages121406(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages12903(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages12905(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback