MD HB954 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 389
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 389
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a Class B beer, wine, and liquor license holder in the 45th legislative district to exchange the license for a Class B-D-7 beer, wine, and liquor license if the licensed premises is in a certain area and an applicant executes a memorandum of understanding with the Mount Vernon-Belvedere Improvement Association; providing that a certain license holder is authorized to provide outdoor table service; etc.
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B and Class C Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 389 |
2020-03-18 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator McCray) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator McCray) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Floor Amendment {713229/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB328 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 390
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Ethics
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Ethics
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |