MD HB950 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Native Plants Program to respond to the increasing demand for, use of, and sale of native plants at retail garden centers and wholesale nurseries and to educate the public on native plants; requiring the Department of Agriculture to administer the Program in coordination with the University of Maryland Extension and to establish the "Maryland Natives" marketing program; requiring the University of Maryland Extension to hire an extension agent to serve as a native plant specialist for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Maryland Native Plants Program
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] | Del. Nick Allen [D] | Del. Regina Boyce [D] | Del. Linda Foley [D] |
Del. Michele Guyton [D] | Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Jeffrie Long [D] |
Del. Sara Love [D] | Del. Todd Morgan [R] | Del. Sheila Ruth [D] | Del. Vaughn Stewart [D] |
Del. Jen Terrasa [D] | Del. Natalie Ziegler [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489 |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-5) |
2023-04-10 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {373626/1 Adopted |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-2) |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {313924/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB836 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Appropriations
Budgets
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Consumer Price Index
Curriculum
Education
Governor
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Higher Education
internet
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Pest Control
Public Information
State Universities and Colleges
Time
Volunteers
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Agriculture, Department of
Appropriations
Budgets
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Consumer Price Index
Curriculum
Education
Governor
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Higher Education
internet
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Pest Control
Public Information
State Universities and Colleges
Time
Volunteers
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 10 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 10 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 10 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 10 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 10 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 10 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 10 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |