MD HB942 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1044
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Crime Solvers Reward Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to provide grants to law enforcement agencies and county reward programs to be used as rewards offered to the public for certain assistance in solving certain crimes; and requiring the Department by October 1, 2025, and each year thereafter, to report to the General Assembly on the number of rewards issued and the total amount of money provided under the Act.
Title
Criminal Procedure – Crime Solvers Reward Fund – Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1044 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Subjects
Counties
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedures
Evidence
Grants
Guns
Interest
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Murder
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedures
Evidence
Grants
Guns
Interest
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Murder
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 1203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0942?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb0942f.pdf |