MD HB940 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing sports wagering license holders to accept wagers on sporting events by certain methods and in certain locations; requiring certain fantasy competition operators to register with the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission before offering fantasy competition or services; authorizing the Commission to impose a fee for the registration of an operator; establishing the Small, Minority-Owned, and Women-Owned Business Sports Wagering Assistance Fund to assist certain businesses entering the sports wagering market; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Floor Amendment 183220/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (Y: 44 N: 93 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 356
2021-04-12HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (124-14)
2021-04-12HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-12SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Beidle) Adopted
2021-04-12SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
2021-04-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-12SenateSubstitute Committee Amendment {655467/1 Adopted
2021-04-12SenateMotion to withdraw Committee Amendments (Senator Zucker) Adopted
2021-04-12SenateMotion Reconsider Committee Amendments (Senator Zucker) Adopted
2021-04-12SenateMotion Returned Second Reading (Senator Zucker) Adopted
2021-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {559730/1 Adopted
2021-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-03-15SenateHearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-12SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2021-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (129-10)
2021-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-10HouseFloor Amendment {183220/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (44-93)
2021-03-09HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Patterson) Adopted
2021-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {365361/1 Adopted
2021-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-02-02HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-02HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects

Allegany County
Appeals
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Casinos
Cecil County
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Contractors
Crimes and Punishments
Education
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Electronic Surveillance
Fees
Fines
Fingerprinting
Gaming
Hearings
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Investments
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Minorities
Minors
Mobile Devices
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Works, Board of
Racing
Records
Registration
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Sports and Recreation
Stadiums
Sunset
Unions
Women
Worcester County
Work, Labor, and Employment

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education5206(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-01(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-03(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-33(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-36(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91D-01(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91D-02(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91D-03(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91D-04(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91D-05(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E01(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E10(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E11(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E12(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E13(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E14(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E15(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E16(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E2(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E3(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E4(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E5(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E6(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E7(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E8(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9-1E9(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0940?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0940f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0940t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0940e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_356_hb0940e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0940_36536101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0940_18322001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0940_55973001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0940_65546701.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0379.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0347.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1479.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1186.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback