MD HB931 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a special Sunday off-sale permit in Prince George's County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners, except under specified circumstances, to issue the permit to specified license holders; providing that no more than 100 permits may be active at any one time; requiring an applicant for a permit to commit to making a specified reinvestment in the business; and authorizing the permit holder to sell specified alcoholic beverages during a specified time on Sunday for consumption off the licensed premises.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Prince George's County - Seven Day Sales PG 318-15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-3) (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-3) (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-3) |
2015-03-23 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Krebs) Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {783092/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Rules and Regulations