MD HB931 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the composition of the Sexual Offender Advisory Board; requiring specified members of the Board to have specified expertise; providing for the terms of the appointed members of the Board to be staggered in a specified manner; altering the duties of the Board; requiring the Board to make a specified report by a specified date; and repealing a requirement that the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene provide staff to the Board.
Title
Public Safety - Sexual Offender Advisory Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | |
2010-04-08 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Senators Brochin, Haines, and Raskin | |
2010-04-06 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-03 | Delegates Dumais, Waldstreicher, and Frank | |
2010-04-03 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-03 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2010-04-03 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-16 | Special Order 3/17 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Ex-Offenders
Health Occupations
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Mental Health
Notices
Parole and Probation
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Registration
Reports
Sexual Offenses
State Hospitals
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Ex-Offenders
Health Occupations
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Mental Health
Notices
Parole and Probation
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Registration
Reports
Sexual Offenses
State Hospitals