MD HB924 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the application dates of certain provisions related to certain holders of Class 4 limited winery licenses.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery Licenses - Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369 |
2022-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB569 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing