MD HB922 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that a park model recreational vehicle is considered to be a travel trailer for the purposes of the Maryland Vehicle Law; defining the term "park model recreational vehicle"; and making specified conforming changes.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Application - Park Model Recreational Vehicles - Definition
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. Darryl Barnes [D] | Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] |
Sen. Cory McCray [D] | Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408 |
2016-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Highways
Licenses
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Real Property
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Licenses
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Real Property
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous