MD HB920 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Highway Administration to pay to a publicly owned utility the cost of relocating water and sewer lines due to specified highway projects financed in whole or in part by federal funds; requiring payments made by the Administration under the Act to be considered part of the cost of specified highway projects and to be included in the Consolidated Transportation Program; and defining specified terms.
Title
State Highway Administration - Relocation of Water and Sewer Lines - Payment of Costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-17 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed Forces
Budgets
Federal Government
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Sewage
Transportation - Highways
Utilities
Water
Armed Forces
Budgets
Federal Government
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Sewage
Transportation - Highways
Utilities
Water