MD HB917 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing St. Mary's County or a municipal corporation in St. Mary's County to grant a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on property that is owned or leased by specified new or expanding businesses; providing that the property tax credit may not be granted for more than 10 years; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2016.
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Tax Credit - New or Expanding Businesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Small Business
St. Mary's County
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment
Property Tax
Small Business
St. Mary's County
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment