MD HB914 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering procedures for the claiming and awarding of grants under the Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program to allow an individual or corporation who paid or incurred qualified capital expenses during the immediately preceding calendar year to submit a grant application.
Title
Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program - Modifications
Sponsors
Del. Dana Jones [D] | Del. Jesse Pippy [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {933722/1 Adopted |
2024-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 3:00 p.m. |
2024-03-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB746 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Agriculture
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Economic Development
Farmland
Grants
Revenue and Taxes
Wineries
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Economic Development
Farmland
Grants
Revenue and Taxes
Wineries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 5 | 2003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |