MD HB906 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the amounts allowed as deductions for certain exemptions under the Maryland income tax; allowing certain individuals to itemize deductions to compute Maryland taxable income; allowing an individual, under certain circumstances, to increase the amount of itemized deductions used to determine Maryland taxable income by a certain amount of real or personal property taxes paid by the individual; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Itemized Deductions and Personal Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2018-03-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |