MD HB905 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to reissue a Class B-D-7 license as a 7-day beer, wine, and liquor (package goods) license if the licensed premises is within the 41st legislative district and is equipped with high-definition cameras that provide continuous, 24-hour monitoring inside and outside the licensed premises; specifying the hours of sale for a 7-day beer, wine, and liquor license authorized under the Act; and providing certain penalties for a certain violation.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Reissuance of Licenses (Community Liquor Empowerment Act of 2018)
Sponsors
Del. Bilal Ali [D] | Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Angela Gibson [D] |
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Del. Keith Haynes [D] | Del. Nick Mosby [D] |
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231 |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {573891/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Penalties and Sentences
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Penalties and Sentences
Time