MD HB903 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a ticket seller or an operator of a ticket seller's Web site from prohibiting the transfer of a specified ticket, requiring an additional fee for the transfer of a specified ticket, or requiring a purchaser of a ticket to present specified identification or a specified credit card to gain entry to an entertainment event.
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2016-02-11 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Credit
Fees
Identification
Prices
Sports and Recreation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Theaters
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Credit
Fees
Identification
Prices
Sports and Recreation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Theaters