MD HB900 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the penalties to which a person is subject if the person fails to renew a license to practice medicine or misrepresents to the public that the person is authorized to practice medicine in the State.
Title
Maryland Board of Physicians - Failure to Renew a License or Misrepresentation as a Licensed Person - Penalties
Sponsors
Del. Wade Kach [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2013-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {866080/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Fraud
Health Occupations
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Fraud
Health Occupations
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences