MD HB9 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adding State residency to the eligibility requirements for dedicating a bridge or another appropriate structure to a deceased member of the armed forces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation - Dedication of Structures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 278
2018-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {260516/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-10HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2017-11-07HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback