MD HB899 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship to make the scholarship applicable to all programs at institutions of higher education in the State; altering the maximum award available, when a scholarship should be credited, and to whom initial awards should be provided under the scholarship; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship - Alterations
Sponsors
Del. Dana Jones [D] | Del. Nick Allen [D] | Del. Heather Bagnall [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] |
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] | Del. Andrew Pruski [D] | Del. Stuart Schmidt [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223 |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2024-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {573620/1 Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2024-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {433724/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB691 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Subjects
Ambulances
Budget and Management, Department of
Community Colleges
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Public Safety
Public Schools
Reports
Rescue Squads
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Volunteers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budget and Management, Department of
Community Colleges
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Public Safety
Public Schools
Reports
Rescue Squads
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Volunteers
Work, Labor, and Employment