MD HB898 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City, a county, or a municipal corporation to provide a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on the dwelling of specified individuals who are elderly or veterans; providing a maximum tax credit of 20% of the county or municipal corporation property tax which may be granted for a period of up to 5 years; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2016; etc.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {355166/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties
Elderly Persons
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Counties
Elderly Persons
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans