MD HB887 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 502
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 502
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the authorized use of certain premiums transferred to the Annuity Bond Fund from the sale of State bonds to include paying for capital projects and, if necessary or appropriate from time to time to comply with the requirements of the Internal Revenue Code, any other use authorized by the Internal Revenue Code.
Title
State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums
Sponsors
Del. Mark Chang [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 36 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 36 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 502 |
2021-04-02 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-35) |
2021-04-02 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {229234/1 Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-36) |
2021-03-02 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB60 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 503
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 8 | 132 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |