MD HB880 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Open Meetings Law Compliance Board, in conjunction with the Office of the Attorney General, to develop and conduct educational programs and distribute educational materials on the requirements of the open meetings law to the staff and attorneys of specified entities; requiring the Board to post specified information on violators of the Act on a specified Web site; prohibiting a public body from meeting in closed session except under specified circumstances; establishing specified reporting requirements; etc.
Title
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525 |
2017-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {724638/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {916087/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Attorneys
Committees and Commissions
Court of Appeals
Education
Education, Boards of
Job Training
Notices
Open Government
Public Employees
Public Officials
Reports
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
State Universities and Colleges
Time
Attorney General
Attorneys
Committees and Commissions
Court of Appeals
Education
Education, Boards of
Job Training
Notices
Open Government
Public Employees
Public Officials
Reports
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
State Universities and Colleges
Time