MD HB87 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting employers from using an applicant's or employee's credit report or credit history in determining whether to deny employment to the applicant, discharge the employee, or determine compensation or the terms, conditions, or privileges of employment; authorizing an employer to request or use an applicant's or employee's credit report or credit history under specified circumstances; authorizing an applicant or employee to file a written complaint with the Commissioner of Labor and Industry for a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Job Applicant Fairness Act
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bobo [D] | Del. Joseph Boteler [R] | Del. Aisha Braveboy [D] |
Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Kirill Reznik [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (34-12) | |
2011-04-02 | Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) Withdrawn | |
2011-04-02 | Motion Reconsider Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) (Senator Pugh) Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-01 | Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (92-46) | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-01-28 | Hearing 2/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-21 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Credit
Disclosure
Discrimination
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Labor and Industry, Division of
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment
Credit
Disclosure
Discrimination
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Labor and Industry, Division of
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment