MD HB869 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment's Wetlands and Waterways Program Division to study permitting for ecological restoration projects; requiring the Department to report on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by June 1, 2024; etc.
Title
Wetlands and Waterways Program Division - Permitting for Ecological Restoration Projects - Required Study
Sponsors
Del. James Gilchrist [D] | Del. Linda Foley [D] | Del. Dana Jones [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] |
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] | Del. Sheila Ruth [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] | Del. Pat Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {633120/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB945 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay Restoration
Conservation
Construction
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Industry and Technology
Investigations and Inquiries
Revenue and Taxes
Water
Weights and Measures
Wetlands
Conservation
Construction
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Industry and Technology
Investigations and Inquiries
Revenue and Taxes
Water
Weights and Measures
Wetlands
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 5 | 203.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |