MD HB868 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the County Commissioners of Washington County are the ultimate authority having jurisdiction over the provision of fire, rescue, and ambulance services in Washington County.
Title
Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McKay [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Ambulances
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Fire Protection
Jurisdiction
Rescue Squads
Washington County
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Fire Protection
Jurisdiction
Rescue Squads
Washington County