MD HB865 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide certain coverage related to prostheses; establishing that certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations must comply with certain provider network requirements; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage for Prostheses (So Every Body Can Move Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-1) |
2024-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {283426/1 Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB614 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Budgets
Data
Discrimination
Equipment
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Insurance Administration
Medical Assistance
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Physically Disabled Persons
Physicians
Prices
Public Health
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Data
Discrimination
Equipment
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Insurance Administration
Medical Assistance
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Physically Disabled Persons
Physicians
Prices
Public Health
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 844 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |