MD HB863 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to exempt property owned by a community open space management entity from the county or municipal corporation property tax; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to enact specified provisions to carry out the exemption; and providing the Act shall take effect June 1, 2014 and be applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2014.
Title
Property Tax - Exemption - Community-Managed Open Space
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {429031/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {985162/2 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Exemptions
Forests and Parks
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Taxes - Property - Local
Counties
Exemptions
Forests and Parks
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Taxes - Property - Local