MD HB862 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 633
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 633
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Making a certain tax credit for commercial rehabilitations under the historic revitalization tax credit program transferable and refundable under certain circumstances; requiring the Director of the Maryland Historic Trust, in consultation with the Smart Growth Subcabinet, to adopt certain regulations; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.
Title
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Transferability (Historic Revitalization Tax Credit Improvement Act of 2020)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 633 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-1) |
2020-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {705461/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB978 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Commercial Rehabilitation
Committees and Commissions
Governor
Historical Matters
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Budgets
Commercial Rehabilitation
Committees and Commissions
Governor
Historical Matters
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 5A | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |