MD SB978 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making a certain tax credit for commercial rehabilitations under the historic revitalization tax credit program transferable and refundable under certain circumstances; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of at least $15,000,000 in fiscal year 2022, increasing in each intervening fiscal year up to $30,000,000 in fiscal year 2025, for the tax credit reserve fund; extending the tax credit through fiscal year 2028; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Title
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Transferability, Funding, and Extension (Historic Revitalization Tax Credit Improvement Act of 2020)
Sponsors
Sen. Katie Hester [D] | Sen. Arthur Ellis [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] |
Sen. Cory McCray [D] | Sen. Johnny Salling [R] | Sen. Chris West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB862 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 633
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Commercial Rehabilitation
Committees and Commissions
Governor
Historical Matters
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Budgets
Commercial Rehabilitation
Committees and Commissions
Governor
Historical Matters
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 5A | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0978?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0978f.pdf |