MD HB861 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an owner-member whose underground facility provides broadband service to mark the location of the underground facility within 4 hours after a time-sensitive ticket is transferred to the owner-member; and defining "time-sensitive ticket" as a ticket that the person initiating a ticket request identifies as requiring an owner-member to mark its underground facility promptly in order to minimize damage to property; etc.
Title
Public Utilities - Underground Facilities - Time-Sensitive Ticket
Sponsors
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Lauren Arikan [R] | Del. Michael Griffith [R] | Del. Jay Jacobs [R] |
Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2020-02-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
internet
Personal Property
Property Damage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Water
Personal Property
Property Damage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 12 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 12 | 126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |