MD HB860 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a State goal of preserving a total of 1,030,000 acres of productive agricultural land by 2030 through the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation, the Maryland GreenPrint Program, the Rural Legacy Program, the Maryland Environmental Trust, the Next Generation Farmland Acquisition Program, and local land preservation programs; and declaring the intent of the General Assembly.
Title
State Planning – Preservation of Agricultural Land – Goal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-8) |
2021-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {130411/1 Adopted |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB692 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 5 | 7A-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |