MD HB860 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing certain survivor benefits to surviving children of certain members of the State Retirement and Pension System; providing for the payment of a certain allowance to surviving children of a member when there is no surviving spouse; providing for the distribution of a certain allowance to surviving children; allowing certain surviving children to participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits program; etc.
Title
Employees', Teachers', and Correctional Officers' Systems - Active Members - Death Benefits
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {994266/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Death
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Evidence
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Retirement Systems
Spouses
State Pensions and Retirement
Teachers
Vital Records
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Death
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Evidence
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Retirement Systems
Spouses
State Pensions and Retirement
Teachers
Vital Records