MD HB86 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB266
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with certain groups, to develop training for certain school personnel to identify symptoms of anaphylaxis, asthma, and respiratory distress in students; requiring the Maryland Department of Health, in consultation with county boards, and authorizing nonpublic schools to establish a policy to obtain, administer, and train certain school personnel to administer emergency bronchodilators to a student who is determined to be, or is perceived to be, experiencing asthma-related symptoms; etc.
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Bronchodilators - Use, Availability, Training, and Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280 |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {653526/1 Adopted |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {273721/1 Adopted |
2024-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2023-10-03 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB266 (Carry Over) 2023-03-16 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
SB180 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
SB180 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Subjects
Communications
Drugs
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Equipment
Forms
Gifts
Good Samaritan
Grants
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Liability
Medical Treatments
Nurses
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Reports
School Administration
Students
Drugs
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Equipment
Forms
Gifts
Good Samaritan
Grants
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Liability
Medical Treatments
Nurses
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Reports
School Administration
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 426.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 426.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |