MD HB266 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB86
Note: Carry Over of previous HB384
Note: Carry Over of previous HB384
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education and authorizing nonpublic schools in the State, before the 2024-2025 school year, to establish a policy to authorize a school nurse or other school personnel designated by the school nurse to administer in emergency situations a bronchodilator to a student who is experiencing asthma, reactive airway disease, or asthma-related symptoms; requiring the Maryland Departments of Health and Education to update State school health service guidelines for the management of students with asthma; etc.
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Bronchodilator Availability and Use - Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2023-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {223926/1 Adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB266 (Carry Over) 2023-03-16 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
HB384 (Carry Over) 2022-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
HB384 (Carry Over) 2022-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Diseases
Drugs
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Forms
Gifts
Grants
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Liability
Medical Conditions
Negligence
Notices
Nurses
Parents and Guardians
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Students
Volunteers
Diseases
Drugs
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Forms
Gifts
Grants
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Liability
Medical Conditions
Negligence
Notices
Nurses
Parents and Guardians
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Students
Volunteers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 426.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 426.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |