MD HB86 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB50
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a landlord to make a certain disclosure to prospective tenants if the landlord uses a ratio utility billing system; making a certain lease provision unenforceable if the landlord fails to make the disclosure; requiring a landlord to document a bill for certain utilities; providing that a tenant organization has the right to assemble during reasonable hours and on reasonable notice to the landlord; expanding certain provisions of law regarding the rights of certain tenants to include certain victims of stalking; etc.
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Residential Leases – Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-32) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Adams) Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {273724/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2021-09-14 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB50 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
SB6 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 34
SB6 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 34
Subjects
Communications
Consumer Protection
Evidence
Landlord and Tenant
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
meetings
Notices
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Utilities
Victims
Consumer Protection
Evidence
Landlord and Tenant
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
meetings
Notices
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Utilities
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 212.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 5A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 5A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 5A-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 5A-04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 5A-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 5A-06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |