MD HB858 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a personal representative of an estate may file for an election for modified administration; providing that, if a personal representative discovers property after the time for filing a verified final report, the representative shall file a report and make a final distribution of the property within specified time periods; providing that an application to prepay inheritance tax for a subsequent interest may be filed with the register of the county where an information report was filed; etc.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Estates and Trusts
Inheritance Tax
Personal Property
Personal Representatives
Real Property
Reports
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Inheritance Tax
Personal Property
Personal Representatives
Real Property
Reports
Taxes - Miscellaneous