MD HB854 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of the Environment to study vernal pools, unique small-scale ecosystems that contribute to the biodiversity in the State; requiring the Department, in conducting the study, to complete a certain inventory, identify certain protection and management measures, and make certain recommendations; and requiring the Department to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of the Environment - Nontidal Wetlands - Study of Vernal Pools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2020-02-05HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback