MD HB854 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of criminal records if the person was found not criminally responsible under any State or local law that prohibits specified acts; specifying that a petition for expungement based on a finding of not criminally responsible under the Act may not be filed within a specified period of time; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible
Sponsors
Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] | Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D] | Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] |
Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (26-21) (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-32) (Y: 102 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Vitale) {873728/1 Rejected (39-93) (Y: 39 N: 93 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-32) (Y: 102 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Vitale) {873728/1 Rejected (39-93) (Y: 39 N: 93 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (26-21) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-32) |
2013-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-23 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) {873728/1 Rejected (39-93) |
2013-03-22 | House | Special Order until 3/23 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {402112/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Assault
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Explosives
Expungement
Loitering
Nuisances
Petitions
Records
Solicitation
Telephones
Trespass
Vagrancy
Weapons
Assault
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Explosives
Expungement
Loitering
Nuisances
Petitions
Records
Solicitation
Telephones
Trespass
Vagrancy
Weapons