MD HB851 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person in Talbot County to hunt deer on private property with a bow and arrow during open season on the last three Sundays in October and the second Sunday in November.
Title
Talbot County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (44-1) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (128-9) | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-03-10 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |