MD HB849 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene from denying an individual access to a home- and community-based services waiver due to lack of funding if, in addition to existing criteria, at least 30 consecutive days of the individual's nursing facility stay are eligible to be paid for by the Maryland Medical Assistance Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Home- and Community-Based Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-04 Approved by the Governor
2010-04-02 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2010-04-01 Second Reading Passed
2010-04-01 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-04-05 Favorable Report by Finance
2010-03-24 Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-23 First Reading Finance
2010-03-31 Returned Passed
2010-03-21 Third Reading Passed (132-0)
2010-03-18 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-17 Special Order 3/18 (Delegate Ali) Adopted
2010-03-17 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-03-16 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2010-02-17 Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-10 First Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback