MD HB842 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-18 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-18 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting foreign persons from purchasing, leasing, or otherwise acquiring certain interests in agricultural land in the State on or after October 1, 2023; and providing that the transfer of a certain interest in agricultural land to a foreign person is void as against the public policy of the State.
Title
Agricultural Land - Foreign Property Interests - Restrictions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-18 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2023-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2023-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 14 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 101.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |