MD HB841 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "practice dental hygiene" for purposes of specified provisions of law governing dental hygienists; authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to adopt regulations; authorizing a dental hygienist, under specified circumstances, to monitor a patient to whom nitrous oxide is administered; requiring a dental hygienist to complete specified educational and examination requirements before performing specified functions; and terminating the Act at the end of September 30, 2014.
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Nitrous Oxide
Sponsors
Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. John Donoghue [D] | Del. Wade Kach [R] |
Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Shane Pendergrass [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-04-08 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Drugs
Education
Examinations
Health Occupations
Patients
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Drugs
Education
Examinations
Health Occupations
Patients
Rules and Regulations
Sunset