MD HB836 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on or before June 1, 2021, the Maryland Department of Health, in collaboration with local health departments of the State and the Maryland State Department of Education, to adopt and implement a 2-year plan to respond to the outbreak of COVID-19; requiring the plan to address the disproportionate impact of the pandemic on underserved and minority communities in the State; establishing the Maryland Public Health Modernization Workgroup to assess the current public health infrastructure and resources in the State; etc.
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 113 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 113 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (113-25) |
2021-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {346786/1 Adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB741 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Assisted Living
Budgets
CARES Act
Chemical Tests
Communications
Community Colleges
Community Facilities and Services
COVID-19
Demographics
Disclosure
Diseases
Education
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Examinations
Federal Aid
Federal Government
General Assembly
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Home Care Services
Immunization
Insurance - Health
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Laws and Ordinances
Local Government Mandates
Medical Assistance
Medical Conditions
Medical Research
Nonprofit Organizations
Nursing Homes
pandemics
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Privatization
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Time
Vulnerable Adults
Work, Labor, and Employment
Assisted Living
Budgets
CARES Act
Chemical Tests
Communications
Community Colleges
Community Facilities and Services
COVID-19
Demographics
Disclosure
Diseases
Education
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Examinations
Federal Aid
Federal Government
General Assembly
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Home Care Services
Immunization
Insurance - Health
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Laws and Ordinances
Local Government Mandates
Medical Assistance
Medical Conditions
Medical Research
Nonprofit Organizations
Nursing Homes
pandemics
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Privatization
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Time
Vulnerable Adults
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2020 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Education | 11 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 16 | 201.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18-9A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18-9A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18-9A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18-9A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 14C-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 14C-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1814 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 856 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |