MD HB827 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each candidate in specified municipal elections to submit a copy of a specified campaign finance report to the State Board of Elections within 10 days after the filing deadline.
Title
Municipal Elections - Campaign Finance Reports - Submission of Copies to the State Board of Elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {955667/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |