MD HB820 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1195
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education, beginning in the 2023-2024 school year, to submit a report on or before April 30 each year to the State Board of Education and the General Assembly on specialty courses offered in public schools in the county in the prior school year; requiring each county board to include certain information about the specialty courses offered in each public school in the county in the report and to post certain data conspicuously on its website; etc.
Title
County Boards of Education - Specialty Courses - Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Del. April Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2021-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {665668/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1195 (Carry Over) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Curriculum
Data
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Gender
internet
Language
Minorities
Poverty
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Curriculum
Data
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Gender
internet
Language
Minorities
Poverty
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 4 | 111.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 111.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |