MD HB82 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to the Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact; repealing a requirement that the Governor execute the compact with the Commonwealth of Virginia and the District of Columbia under specified circumstances; repealing the Woodrow Wilson Memorial Bridge and Tunnel Authority; repealing a requirement that the compact may not be interpreted to affect the levy of specified taxes; repealing the specified powers of the Authority to operate a project to upgrade the Interstate 95 Potomac River crossing; etc.
Title
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681 |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bonds
Bridges and Tunnels
Committees and Commissions
Condemnation
Exemptions
Federal Government
Fees
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Law Enforcement
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Utilities
Bonds
Bridges and Tunnels
Committees and Commissions
Condemnation
Exemptions
Federal Government
Fees
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Law Enforcement
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Utilities