MD HB816 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - House Requests Senate Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - House Requests Senate Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County to extend the deadline by which a holder of an alcoholic beverages license must file an application for renewal; and extending the expiration date for certain licenses issued by the Board to July 1, 2025.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal PG 308-24
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2024-04-08 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {173325/1 Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {913623/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB51 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Forms
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Forms
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |