MD HB816 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 830
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a public-private partnership agreement from including certain provisions regarding compensation for certain entities under certain circumstances; and prohibiting a public-private partnership agreement for a project involving road, highway, or bridge assets from including a certain noncompete clause that would inhibit the planning, construction, or implementation of State-funded transit projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Compensation Provisions and Noncompete Clauses - Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-5) (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-26HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 830
2018-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20SenateReassigned to Budget and Taxation
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (130-5)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {830918/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback