MD HB814 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing all county boards of education, rather than only certain county boards of education, to waive the requirement that a participating employer reimburse the county for the cost of the premium for workers' compensation coverage provided to students placed in unpaid work-based learning experiences or pay a certain fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning Experiences

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 207
2018-04-02HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-13HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-08HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback